Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Francesco Cardinal Gonzaga

Deceased

Administrator of Mantova

Cardinal-Deacon of Sant’Agata de’ Goti

Cardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria Nuova

Administrator of Bologna


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1444¹BornMantua
18 Dec 146118.0Elevated to Cardinal
2 Apr 146218.3AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria Nuova
12 Aug 146420.6AppointedBishop of Brixen {Bressanone}, Italy
20 Aug 146622.6AppointedAdministrator of Mantova, Italy
1475²31.0AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Agata de’ Goti
26 Jul 147632.6AppointedAdministrator of Bologna, Italy
21 Oct 148339.8DiedAdministrator of Mantova, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francesco Gonzaga:
Cardinal Francesco Gonzaga (died ) Administrator of Mantova

  • a cardinal for 21.8 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 18 Dec 1461

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.5, 24 Dec 2013; data: 25 Dec 2013