Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Sebastian Glavinich

Deceased

Bishop of Senj (-Modruš)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Jan 1632BornPesino
26 Mar 166028.2Ordained PriestPriest
8 May 169058.3AppointedBishop of Senj (-Modruš), Croatia
8 Feb 169159.1Ordained BishopBishop of Senj (-Modruš), Croatia
1698¹66.0DiedBishop of Senj (-Modruš), Croatia

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Sebastian Glavinich:
Bishop Sebastian Glavinich (born ) Bishop of Senj (-Modruš)

  • a priest for 37.8 years
  • a bishop for 6.9 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 349
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 210, Number 17,358

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013