Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gjergji Junki (Giunchi)

Deceased

Bishop of Bar (Antivari), Montenegro

Apostolic Administrator of Budua (Budva)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Feb 1727Born
3 Jan 175729.8AppointedBishop of Pult, Albania
9 Dec 176538.8AppointedBishop of Lezhë {Lesh, Alessio}, Albania
24 Jul 178659.4AppointedBishop of Bar (Antivari), Montenegro
1 Sep 178659.5AppointedApostolic Administrator of Budua (Budva), Montenegro
26 Jan 178759.9DiedBishop of Bar (Antivari), Montenegro

MicroData Summary for Gjergji Junki (Giunchi)
Bishop Gjergji Junki (Giunchi) (born , died ) Bishop of Bar (Antivari)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLivari

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 76, and Page 86
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 133, and Page 349
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1757, Number 44

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast