Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Costanzo Giordano, O.C.D. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Sassari, Italy

Note/Previous Titular See: (Constantino da San Lodovico)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Oct 1655Born
24 Sep 167822.9Ordained DeaconDeacon of Order of Discalced Carmelites
23 Sep 167923.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Discalced Carmelites
16 Dec 172671.1AppointedArchbishop of Sassari, Italy
Nov 1729³74.0DiedArchbishop of Sassari, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Costanzo Giordano
Archbishop Costanzo Giordano O.C.D. (born , died Nov 1729) Archbishop of Sassari

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTurino, Archdiocese of Torino {Turin}

  • a priest for 50.1 years

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • c2+: CB
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 396
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1726, Number 42
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 86, Number 7,136
  • nm/~ob/c2+: CB, 30 Jul 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 31 Jul 2021

Quantcast