Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Marino Gini

Deceased

Bishop of Sapė, Albania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Jun 1649³Born
26 Nov 170354.4AppointedBishop of Pult (Pulati), Albania
1704¹54.5Ordained BishopBishop of Pult (Pulati), Albania
29 Mar 171969.7AppointedBishop of Sapė, Albania
1720¹70.5DiedBishop of Sapė, Albania

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Marino Gini
Bishop Marino Gini (born , died 1720) Bishop of Sapė

EventPlace
Birth PlaceShkodrė

  • a bishop for 16.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 325, and Page 344
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,704, Number 27

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast