Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pietro Ginaj

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Pult (Pulati), Albania


Events

DateEventTitle
4 Jul 1817AppointedBishop of Pult (Pulati), Albania
1 Apr 1832ResignedBishop of Pult (Pulati), Albania
1 Apr 1833DiedBishop Emeritus of Pult (Pulati), Albania

MicroData Summary for Pietro Ginaj
Bishop Pietro Ginaj (died ) Bishop Emeritus of Pult (Pulati)

Source(s):
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,817, Number 42
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 315

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast