Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Giliberti

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Pompeiopolis in Cilicia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Dec 1733BornSolofra, Italy
17 Dec 175724.0Ordained PriestPriest
3 Apr 177541.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Pompeiopolis in Cilicia

MicroData Summary for Francesco Giliberti:
Bishop Francesco Giliberti (born ) Titular Bishop of Pompeiopolis in Cilicia

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 343
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1775, Number 60

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 21 Dec 2015