Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Antonio Giattini

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Jesi, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Feb 1651Born
24 Jun 168534.3Ordained DeaconDeacon
29 Jun 168534.3Ordained PriestPriest
7 Dec 171665.8AppointedBishop of Jesi, Italy
27 Sep 172473.6ResignedBishop of Jesi, Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco Antonio Giattini
Bishop Francesco Antonio Giattini (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Jesi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMantefano

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 71
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1716, Number 36
  • bp: CB, 1 Sep 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast