Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Anselmo Giabbani, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Prior General Emeritus of Order of Saint Benedict

Titular See: (Camaldolesi)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Jul 1908Born
31 May 192516.9ProfessedMember of Order of Saint Benedict
29 Jun 193223.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
195142.4AppointedPrior General of Order of Saint Benedict
196354.4ResignedPrior General of Order of Saint Benedict
18 Aug 200496.1DiedPrior General Emeritus of Order of Saint Benedict

MicroData Summary for Anselmo Giabbani (VIAF: 162600671)
Father Anselmo Giabbani O.S.B. (born , died ) Prior General Emeritus of Order of Saint Benedict

EventPlace
Birth PlaceStia
Death PlaceCamaldoli

  • a priest for 72.1 years

Source(s):
  • bd/prof/op: CB, 29 Feb 2012

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast