Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Cosimo Gheri

Deceased

Administrator of Fano, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Aug 1513Born
24 Jan 153016.4AppointedAdministrator of Fano, Italy
22 Sep 153724.1DiedAdministrator of Fano, Italy

MicroData Summary for Cosimo Gheri
Bishop Cosimo Gheri (born , died ) Administrator of Fano

EventPlace
Birth PlacePistoia

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 194

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast