Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Giovanni Benedetti Gentilotti

Deceased

Bishop-Elect of Trento


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Jul 1672BornTrento
9 Sep 172553.1AppointedBishop of Trento, Italy
20 Sep 172553.1DiedBishop-Elect of Trento, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Benedetti Gentilotti:
Father Giovanni Benedetti Gentilotti (born , died ) Bishop-Elect of Trento

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe der Deutschsprachigen Länder

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015