Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Marcantonio Genovesi

Deceased

Bishop of Isernia


Events

DateEventTitle
9 May 1603AppointedBishop of Montemarano, Italy
11 May 1603Ordained BishopBishop of Montemarano, Italy
26 Sep 1611AppointedBishop of Isernia, Italy
7 Nov 1624DiedBishop of Isernia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Marcantonio Genovesi:
Bishop Marcantonio Genovesi (died ) Bishop of Isernia

  • a bishop for 21.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 211, and Page 247
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1603, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 6 Feb 2015