Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Biagio Geminelli

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Lindinen


Events

DateEventTitle
29 Jan 1354AppointedBishop of Pesaro, Italy
21 Aug 1357AppointedBishop of Chiusi, Italy
16 Apr 1386AppointedTitular Bishop of Lindinen

MicroData Summary for Biagio Geminelli
Bishop Biagio Geminelli , Titular Bishop of Lindinen

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 395, and Page 195
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 307

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 26 Jun 2021

Quantcast