Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Luigi Cardinal Gazzoli

Deceased

Priest of the Roman Curia - Other

Cardinal-Deacon of Sant’Adriano al Foro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 May 1735BornTerni, Italy
15 Nov 180166.5Ordained PriestPriest
16 May 180368.0Elevated to CardinalIn Pectore
11 Jul 180368.2Elevated to Cardinal
11 Jul 180368.2AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Adriano al Foro
23 Jun 180974.1DiedPriest of the Roman Curia - Other

MicroData Summary for Luigi Gazzoli:
Cardinal Luigi Gazzoli (born , died ) Priest of Roman Curia - Other

  • a priest for 7.6 years
  • a cardinal for 6.1 years

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013