Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Peter Anton Gaus von Homberg

Deceased

Bishop of Pedena, Austria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Jan 1646³Born
22 Dec 166822.9Ordained DeaconDeacon of Pedena, Austria
13 Jan 166923.0Ordained PriestPriest of Pedena, Austria
15 May 169246.3SelectedBishop of Pedena, Austria
9 Mar 169347.1ConfirmedBishop of Pedena, Austria
9 Jun 169347.4Ordained BishopBishop of Pedena, Austria
25 Apr 171670.2DiedBishop of Pedena, Austria

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Peter Anton Gaus von Homberg
Bishop Peter Anton Gaus von Homberg (born , died ) Bishop of Pedena

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRijeka

  • a priest for 47.2 years
  • a bishop for 22.8 years

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe der Deutschsprachigen Länder
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 311
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1693, Number 24

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast