Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Francesco Cardinal Gaude, O.P. †

Deceased

Priest of Order of Friars Preachers

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria sopra Minerva


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Apr 1809BornCambiano, Italy
Nov 183223.6Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
17 Dec 185546.7Elevated to Cardinal
20 Dec 185546.7AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Ara Coeli
21 Dec 185748.7AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria sopra Minerva
14 Dec 186051.7DiedPriest of Order of Friars Preachers

MicroData Summary for Francesco Gaude:
Cardinal Francesco Gaude O.P. (born , died ) Priest of Order of Friars Preachers

  • a priest for 28.1 years
  • a cardinal for 5.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 50

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013