Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Mercurino Arborio Cardinal di Gattinara

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of San Giovanni a Porta Latina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Jun 1465Born
13 Aug 152964.1Elevated to Cardinal
3 Sep 152964.2InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Giovanni a Porta Latina
5 Jun 153064.9DiedCardinal-Priest of San Giovanni a Porta Latina

MicroData Summary for Mercurino Arborio di Gattinara (VIAF: 9855777)
Mercurino Arborio Cardinal di Gattinara (born , died ) Cardinal-Priest of San Giovanni a Porta Latina

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCastle of Gattinara, Italy

  • a cardinal for .8 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 13 Aug 1529

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast