Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Philippe Gaston

Deceased

Archbishop of Bordeaux, France


Events

DateEventTitle
22 May 1338AppointedBishop of Sion {Sitten}, Switzerland
25 Sep 1342AppointedArchbishop of Nicosia, Cyprus
21 Jul 1360AppointedArchbishop of Bordeaux, France
1361¹DiedArchbishop of Bordeaux, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Philippe Gaston
Archbishop Philippe Gaston (died 1361) Archbishop of Bordeaux

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 150, and Page 365
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 442

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 21 May 2019

Quantcast