Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pedro La Gasca

Deceased

Bishop of Sigüenza, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1493¹Born
6 Apr 155158.2AppointedBishop of Palencia, Spain
17 May 155158.3Ordained BishopBishop of Palencia, Spain
2 Jun 156168.4AppointedBishop of Sigüenza, Spain
20 Nov 156774.8DiedBishop of Sigüenza, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pedro La Gasca (VIAF: 23765582)
Bishop Pedro La Gasca (born 1493, died ) Bishop of Sigüenza

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNavarregadilla, Diocese of Ávila
Ordained BishopPalais Royal, Barcelona, Diocese of Barcelona

  • a bishop for 16.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 63, Number 358
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 267, and Page 296
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1551, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018