Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan García Palomeque

Deceased

Bishop of Osma


Events

DateEventTitle
24 Oct 1354AppointedBishop of Badajoz, Spain
18 Oct 1355Ordained BishopBishop of Badajoz, Spain
4 Mar 1373AppointedBishop of Osma, Spain
Oct 1373²DiedBishop of Osma, Spain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Juan García Palomeque:
Bishop Juan García Palomeque , Bishop of Osma

  • a bishop for 17.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 383
  • ob/c23: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 197, Number 16,003
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 304, Number 160

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015