Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan García Valdemora

Deceased

Bishop of Tuy, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1550¹Born
27 Aug 160353.6AppointedBishop of Lugo, Spain
16 Jul 161262.5AppointedBishop of Tuy, Spain
15 Aug 162070.6DiedBishop of Tuy, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Juan García Valdemora
Bishop Juan García Valdemora (born 1550, died ) Bishop of Tuy

EventPlace
Birth PlaceEl Casar de Talamanca

Source(s):
  • bp/bd: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 224, and Page 348
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,500, Page 119, Number 755
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,603, Number 37

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast