Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Luís Eduardo García Rodríguez, M.X.Y. †

Deceased

Prefect of Arauca, Colombia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Mar 1907Born
25 Jun 194538.2AppointedPrefect of Labateca, Colombia
31 Jul 195649.3AppointedPrefect of Arauca, Colombia
8 Jan 197062.8DiedPrefect of Arauca, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Luís Eduardo García Rodríguez
Father Luís Eduardo García Rodríguez M.X.Y. (born , died ) Prefect of Arauca

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAbriaquí
Death PlaceChuscal

Source(s):
  • bp/d: CB, 5 Apr 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast