Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thomas Gao Yuchen

Deceased

Bishop of Jingxian [Kinghsien], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Jun 1918Born
15 Aug 195537.1Ordained PriestPriest
1989²70.5Ordained BishopBishop of Jingxian [Kinghsien], China

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Thomas Gao Yuchen
Bishop Thomas Gao Yuchen (born ) Bishop of Jingxian [Kinghsien]

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 25 Dec 2019
  • b: Clandestine Epsicopal Ordinations in China, Year 2,018, Number 62

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast