Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pedro Gamboa

Deceased

Bishop of Carinola (Calina), Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
20 Dec 1497AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Carinola (Calina), Italy
30 Sep 1498Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Carinola (Calina), Italy
1501¹SucceededBishop of Carinola (Calina), Italy
18 Nov 1510³DiedBishop of Carinola (Calina), Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pedro Gamboa
Bishop Pedro Gamboa (died ) Bishop of Carinola (Calina)

EventPlace
Ordained BishopS. Onuphre, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 12.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 114
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 146
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 117, Number 10,434
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,500, Page 312, Number 211
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,498, Number 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast