Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Girolamo Gallarati

Deceased

Bishop of Alessandria (della Paglia), Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
27 Mar 1560AppointedBishop of Nepi e Sutri, Italy
9 Jun 1564AppointedBishop of Alessandria (della Paglia), Italy
3 Jun 1565InstalledBishop of Alessandria (della Paglia), Italy
28 Oct 1568DiedBishop of Alessandria (della Paglia), Italy

MicroData Summary for Girolamo Gallarati
Bishop Girolamo Gallarati (died ) Bishop of Alessandria (della Paglia)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMilano, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}
Death PlaceCozzo

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 103, and Page 306
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1560, Number 25*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018