Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Galiana

Deceased

Bishop of Mallorca, Spain


Events

DateEventTitle
5 Jul 1363AppointedBishop of Mallorca, Spain
8 Oct 1363Ordained BishopBishop of Mallorca, Spain
9 Apr 1375DiedBishop of Mallorca, Spain

MicroData Summary for Antonio Galiana
Bishop Antonio Galiana (died ) Bishop of Mallorca

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMallorca, Diocese of Mallorca
Ordained BishopPalma de Mallorca, Diocese of Mallorca

  • a bishop for 11.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 323
  • b/c23: Episcopologio Espaņol, Volume 1,500, Page 304, Number 163
  • b/c23: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 113, Number 9,979

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast