Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Carlo Galgano

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Belcastro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Mar 1633BornBagnolo
7 Oct 165724.5Ordained PriestPriest
22 Feb 167238.9AppointedBishop of Belcastro, Italy
1683²49.7ResignedBishop of Belcastro, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Carlo Galgano:
Bishop Carlo Galgano (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Belcastro

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 115
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1672, Number 35

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 11 Apr 2015; Data: 12 Apr 2015