Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop John Galata

Deceased

Archbishop of Durrës (Durazzo), Albania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1680¹Born
30 Sep 172040.7AppointedBishop of Sapë, Albania
15 Nov 172848.8AppointedBishop of Lezhë {Lesh, Alessio}, Albania
26 Jan 173959.0AppointedArchbishop of Durrës (Durazzo), Albania
28 Feb 175272.1DiedArchbishop of Durrës (Durazzo), Albania

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for John Galata
Archbishop John Galata (born 1680, died ) Archbishop of Durrës (Durazzo)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCurbini

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 78, and Page 344
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1720, Number 33
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 203
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 224, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast