Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Domenico Antonio Gagliano, C.R. †

Deceased

Bishop of Lettere (-Gragnano), Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Aug 1662Born
4 Jun 168926.7Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of Clerics Regular
14 Oct 170947.1AppointedBishop of Lettere (-Gragnano), Italy
5 Jul 171350.8DiedBishop of Lettere (-Gragnano), Italy

MicroData Summary for Domenico Antonio Gagliano
Bishop Domenico Antonio Gagliano C.R. (born , died ) Bishop of Lettere (-Gragnano)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNapoli

  • a priest for 24.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 246
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1709, Number 25

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast