Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Taddeo Cardinal Gaddi

Deceased

Archbishop of Cosenza, Italy

Cardinal-Priest of San Silvestro in Capite


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Jan 1520Born
21 Jun 153515.4AppointedArchbishop of Cosenza, Italy
15 Mar 155737.1Elevated to Cardinal
24 Mar 155737.1InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Silvestro in Capite
22 Dec 156141.9DiedArchbishop of Cosenza, Italy

MicroData Summary for Taddeo Gaddi
Taddeo Cardinal Gaddi (born , died ) Archbishop of Cosenza

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFirenze, Archdiocese of Firenze {Florence}
Death PlaceS. Leonardo, Monastery, Apullia
Buried Place (Original)Family Tomb, S. Maria Novella, Church, Firenze, Archdiocese of Firenze {Florence}

  • a cardinal for 4.7 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 15 Mar 1557
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 183
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1535, Number 16*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 17 Jul 2017