Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Girolamo Gaddi

Deceased

Bishop of Cortona, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1520¹Born
16 Dec 156242.9AppointedBishop of Cortona, Italy
25 Jul 156343.5Ordained BishopBishop of Cortona, Italy
1572²52.0DiedBishop of Cortona, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Girolamo Gaddi (VIAF: 28246946)
Bishop Girolamo Gaddi (born 1520, died 1572) Bishop of Cortona

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFirenze, Archdiocese of Firenze {Florence}
Ordained BishopSanta Anna, Church, Pisa, Archdiocese of Pisa

  • a bishop for 8.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: CB, 16 Jan 2014
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 217, Number 18,015
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 179
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1563, Number 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018