Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Giovanni Maria Cardinal Gabrielli, O. Cist. †

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Pudenziana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Jan 1654BornCittą di Castello, Italy
14 Nov 169945.8Elevated to Cardinal
3 Feb 170046.1InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santa Pudenziana
17 Sep 171157.7DiedCardinal-Priest of Santa Pudenziana

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Maria Gabrielli:
Cardinal Giovanni Maria Gabrielli O. Cist. (born , died ) Cardinal-Priest of Santa Pudenziana

  • a cardinal for 11.8 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 14 Nov 1699

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013