Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Johann Georg Fuchs von Dornheim

Deceased

Bishop-Elect of Bamberg, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Apr 1586Born
13 Feb 162336.8SelectedBishop of Bamberg, Germany
17 Feb 162437.8ConfirmedBishop of Bamberg, Germany
29 Mar 163346.9DiedBishop-Elect of Bamberg, Germany

MicroData Summary for Johann Georg Fuchs von Dornheim (VIAF: 5718089)
Father Johann Georg Fuchs von Dornheim (born , died ) Bishop-Elect of Bamberg

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWiesentheid

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 109
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1624, Number 56
  • not ordb: CB, 10 Jan 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 11 Jan 2017