Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paolo Fusco

Deceased

Bishop of Sarno, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
25 Sep 1570AppointedBishop of Ravello, Italy
17 Feb 1578AppointedBishop of Sarno, Italy
27 Apr 1583DiedBishop of Sarno, Italy

MicroData Summary for Paolo Fusco (VIAF: 76655923)
Bishop Paolo Fusco (died ) Bishop of Sarno

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 283, and Page 293
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1570, Number 14*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018