Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop André Furtado de Mendonça

Deceased

Bishop of Miranda (do Douro), Portugal


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1632¹Born
12 Dec 167240.9AppointedBishop of Miranda (do Douro), Portugal
5 Mar 167341.1Ordained BishopBishop of Miranda (do Douro), Portugal
21 Jul 167644.5DiedBishop of Miranda (do Douro), Portugal

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for André Furtado de Mendonça
Bishop André Furtado de Mendonça (born 1632, died ) Bishop of Miranda (do Douro)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLisbon

  • a bishop for 3.3 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 270
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1673, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018