Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Giuseppe Alessandro Cardinal Furietti

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of Santi Quirico e Giulitta


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Jan 1685BornBergamo, Italy
24 Sep 175974.6Elevated to Cardinal
19 Nov 175974.8InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santi Quirico e Giulitta
14 Jan 176478.9DiedCardinal-Priest of Santi Quirico e Giulitta

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Alessandro Furietti:
Giuseppe Alessandro Cardinal Furietti (born , died ) Cardinal-Priest of Santi Quirico e Giulitta

  • a cardinal for 4.3 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 24 Sep 1759

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015