Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Miguel de Fuentes Blas y Altossano, O. Cist. †

Deceased

Bishop of Lugo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1622²BornTorija
1647²25.0Ordained PriestPriest
9 Apr 168563.2AppointedBishop of Lugo, Spain
12 Aug 168563.6Ordained BishopBishop of Lugo, Spain
25 May 169977.3DiedBishop of Lugo, Spain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Miguel de Fuentes Blas y Altossano:
Bishop Miguel de Fuentes Blas y Altossano O. Cist. (born 1622, died ) Bishop of Lugo

  • a priest for 52.3 years
  • a bishop for 13.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 248
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 226, Number 1,402
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1685, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 21 Apr 2015