Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Antonio Maria Cardinal Frosini

Deceased

Prefect of the Congregation for Indulgences and Relics

Cardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Cosmedin


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Sep 1751Born
10 Mar 182371.5Elevated to Cardinal
16 May 182371.6AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Cosmedin
1 Oct 182675.0AppointedPrefect of the Congregation for Indulgences and Relics
8 Jul 183482.8DiedPrefect Emeritus of the Congregation for Indulgences and Relics

MicroData Summary for Antonio Maria Frosini (VIAF: 89059881)
Antonio Maria Cardinal Frosini (born , died ) Prefect of Indulgences and Relics

EventPlace
Birth PlaceModena, Diocese of Modena, Italy
Death PlaceS. Bonaventura alla Polveriera, Church, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a cardinal for 11.3 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 10 Mar 1823

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 24 Jun 2019

Quantcast