Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nicolas French

Deceased

Bishop of Ferns, Ireland

Auxiliary Bishop of Gent {Ghent, Gand}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1604²Born
6 Feb 164541.0AppointedBishop of Ferns, Ireland
3 Dec 164541.9Ordained BishopBishop of Ferns, Ireland
1652²48.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Santiago de Compostela, Spain
1666²62.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Paris, France
1668²64.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Gent {Ghent, Gand}, Belgium
23 Aug 167874.6DiedBishop of Ferns, Ireland

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Nicolas French (VIAF: 2814808)
Bishop Nicolas French (born 1604, died ) Bishop of Ferns

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBally Tory

  • a bishop for 32.7 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 186
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 175, Number 1,086
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1645, Number 48

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast