Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pierre Fresnel

Deceased

Bishop of Lisieux, France


Events

DateEventTitle
17 Oct 1390AppointedBishop of Meaux, France
20 Aug 1409AppointedBishop of Noyon, France
28 Jan 1415AppointedBishop of Lisieux, France
12 Jun 1418DiedBishop of Lisieux, France

MicroData Summary for Pierre Fresnel
Bishop Pierre Fresnel (died ) Bishop of Lisieux

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 373, and Page 304
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 334

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 27 Feb 2021

Quantcast