Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Patrick French, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Elphin, Ireland


Events

DateEventTitle
9 Nov 1731SelectedBishop of Elphin, Ireland
23 Nov 1731ConfirmedBishop of Elphin, Ireland
1732¹Ordained BishopBishop of Elphin, Ireland
27 Aug 1748DiedBishop of Elphin, Ireland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Patrick French
Bishop Patrick French O.F.M. (died ) Bishop of Elphin

  • a bishop for 16.6 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 207
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1732, Number 43
  • b: The Irish Catholic Episcopal Corps, 1657-1829, Volume 2, Page 49

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast