Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Marino Fregeno

Deceased

Bishop of Kammin (Camin)


Events

DateEventTitle
16 Nov 1478AppointedBishop of Kammin (Camin), Germany
21 Mar 1479Ordained BishopBishop of Kammin (Camin), Germany
7 Jul 1482DiedBishop of Kammin (Camin), Germany

MicroData Summary for Marino Fregeno:
Bishop Marino Fregeno (died ) Bishop of Kammin (Camin)

  • a bishop for 3.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 2, Page 116
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 178, Number 14,734

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 1 Oct 2014