Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Abbot Giovanni Battista Franzoni, O.S.B.

Abbot Emeritus of San Paolo fuori le Mura

Titular See: (resigned the priesthood)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Nov 1928 BornVarna, Bulgaria
5 Jul 195122.6ProfessedMember of Order of Saint Benedict
25 Jan 195526.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
3 Mar 196435.3SelectedAbbot of San Paolo fuori le Mura, Italy
11 Mar 196435.3ConfirmedAbbot of San Paolo fuori le Mura, Italy
197344.1ResignedAbbot of San Paolo fuori le Mura, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Battista Franzoni (VIAF: 90128099)
Abbot Giovanni Battista Franzoni O.S.B. (born ) Abbot Emeritus of San Paolo fuori le Mura

Please contact the Abbot through the Territorial Abbey of San Paolo fuori le Mura.

  • a priest for years

Source(s):
  • b: JPG
  • prof: CB, 18 Feb 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 2 Mar 2016