Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bl. Antonio Franco

Deceased

Prelate of Santa Lucia del Mela, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Sep 1585Born
12 Nov 161631.1AppointedPrelate of Santa Lucia del Mela, Italy
2 Sep 162640.9DiedPrelate of Santa Lucia del Mela, Italy
2 Sep 2013Beatified

MicroData Summary for Bl. Antonio Franco
Bishop Bl. Antonio Franco (born , died ) Prelate of Santa Lucia del Mela

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNapoli

Source(s):

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018