Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ignazio Maria Fraganeschi

Deceased

Bishop of Cremona, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Sep 1710Born
4 Apr 173322.5Ordained DeaconDeacon
19 Sep 173322.9Ordained PriestPriest
22 Sep 174938.9AppointedBishop of Cremona, Italy
29 Sep 174939.0Ordained BishopBishop of Cremona, Italy
16 Aug 179079.8DiedBishop of Cremona, Italy

MicroData Summary for Ignazio Maria Fraganeschi
Bishop Ignazio Maria Fraganeschi (born , died ) Bishop of Cremona

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCremona, Diocese of Cremona

  • a priest for 56.9 years
  • a bishop for 40.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,775
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 186
  • c34: CB, 13 May 2013
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,749, Number 25

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast