Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giacomo Francone

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Sidon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Mar 1737³BornPollena, Italy
1 Mar 176022.9Ordained PriestPriest
26 Sep 178548.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Sidon

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giacomo Francone:
Bishop Giacomo Francone (born ) Titular Bishop of Sidon

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 380
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1785, Number 46

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.1, 31 Dec 2015; Data: 16 Jan 2016