Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Orazio Fortunato

Deceased

Bishop of Nard˛, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1634¹Born
22 Dec 165824.9Ordained PriestPriest
6 Oct 167036.7AppointedBishop of San Severo, Italy
10 Jan 167844.0AppointedBishop of Nard˛, Italy
1 Apr 169258.2AppointedVicegerent of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Jan 1693³59.0ResignedVicegerent of Roma {Rome}, Italy
23 Jul 170773.5DiedBishop of Nard˛, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Orazio Fortunato
Bishop Orazio Fortunato (born 1634, died ) Bishop of Nard˛

EventPlace
Birth PlaceS. Archangeli

  • a priest for 48.5 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 286, and Page 355
  • b: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1670, Number 45
  • vice: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 86, Additions/Corrections (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast