Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Guglielmo de’ Folchi

Deceased

Bishop of Fiesole, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
1 Jul 1504AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Fiesole, Italy
1510¹SucceededBishop of Fiesole, Italy
1 May 1510Ordained BishopBishop of Fiesole, Italy
17 Apr 1530DiedBishop of Fiesole, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Guglielmo de’ Folchi
Bishop Guglielmo de’ Folchi (died ) Bishop of Fiesole

EventPlace
Ordained BishopCathedral, Fiesole, Diocese of Fiesole

  • a bishop for 19.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 203, Number 16,671
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 196
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,510, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast