Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Vincenzo Fois

Deceased

Former Bishop-Elect of Ogliastra


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Nov 1779BornOzieri
8 Jan 180424.1Ordained PriestPriest
31 Jul 183454.7SelectedBishop of Ogliastra, Italy
19 May 183757.5ConfirmedBishop of Ogliastra, Italy
3 Aug 183858.7ResignedBishop-Elect of Ogliastra, Italy
Dec 1838³59.0DiedFormer Bishop-Elect of Ogliastra, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Vincenzo Fois
Father Vincenzo Fois (born , died Dec 1838) Former Bishop-Elect of Ogliastra

  • a priest for 34.8 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 290
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1837

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 15 Aug 2016