Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thomas Flynn

Deceased

Bishop of Ardagh (and Clonmacnois), Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1655²Born
2 Oct 171762.7AppointedBishop of Ardagh (and Clonmacnois), Ireland
15 Jul 171863.5Ordained BishopBishop of Ardagh (and Clonmacnois), Ireland
29 Jan 173075.0DiedBishop of Ardagh (and Clonmacnois), Ireland

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Thomas Flynn
Bishop Thomas Flynn (born 1655, died ) Bishop of Ardagh (and Clonmacnois)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceErrew, Co. Leitrim
Ordained PriestCarinn
Buried Place (Original)Cloone, Cemetery

  • a bishop for 11.5 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 96
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1718, Number 73
  • b: The Irish Catholic Episcopal Corps, 1657-1829, Volume 2, Page 47

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 21 Aug 2020

Quantcast